TN HJR0009 | 2019-2020 | 111th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on January 16 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-16 - Signed by Governor.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on January 16 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-16 - Signed by Governor.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
Recesses organizational session from close of business on Thursday, January 10, 2019, until Friday, January 18, 2019.
Title
Recesses organizational session from close of business on Thursday, January 10, 2019, until Friday, January 18, 2019.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-01-16 | Signed by Governor. | |
2019-01-15 | Senate | Signed by Senate Speaker |
2019-01-10 | House | Signed by H. Speaker |
2019-01-10 | House | Enrolled; ready for sig. of H. Speaker. |
2019-01-10 | Senate | Rules Suspended, Concurred, voice vote |
2019-01-10 | Senate | Received from House, Held on desk pending committee appintments |
2019-01-09 | House | Engrossed; ready for transmission to Sen. |
2019-01-09 | House | R/S Intro., adopted v.v. |
2019-01-09 | House | Filed for introduction |
Subjects
Tennessee State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://wapp.capitol.tn.gov/apps/Billinfo/default.aspx?BillNumber=HJR0009&ga=111 |
Text | https://www.capitol.tn.gov/Bills/111/Bill/HJR0009.pdf |