TN HJR0008 | 2021-2022 | 112th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 20-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 8 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-04-06 - Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate Judiciary Committee
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]

Summary

Makes application to Congress for the purpose of calling an Article V convention to propose an amendment to the United States Constitution to set a limit on the number of terms to which a person may be elected as a member of the Congress of the United States.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

A RESOLUTION to make application to the Congress of the United States pursuant to Article V of the United States Constitution to call a convention for proposing amendments to set a limit on the number of terms to which a person may be elected as a Member of the United States House of Representatives and to set a limit on the number of terms to which a person may be elected as a Member of the United States Senate.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-04-08 - House - FLOOR VOTE: REGULAR CALENDAR MOTION TO ADOPT (Y: 53 N: 34 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-09 - House - HOUSE STATE GOVERNMENT COMMITTEE: Rec. for pass; ref to Calendar & Rules Committee (Y: 13 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2022-04-06SenateAssigned to General Subcommittee of Senate Judiciary Committee
2022-04-01SenateSponsor(s) Added.
2022-03-30SenatePlaced on Senate Judiciary Committee calendar for 4/6/2022
2022-03-30SenateAction deferred in Senate Judiciary Committee to 4/5/2022
2022-03-30SenatePlaced on Senate Judiciary Committee calendar for 3/30/2022
2022-03-29SenateAction deferred in Senate Judiciary Committee to 3/30/2022
2022-03-23SenatePlaced on Senate Judiciary Committee calendar for 3/29/2022
2022-03-22SenateAction deferred in Senate Judiciary Committee to 3/29/2022
2022-03-16SenatePlaced on Senate Judiciary Committee calendar for 3/22/2022
2022-02-15SenateAction deferred in Senate Judiciary Committee to 3/8/2022
2022-02-09SenatePlaced on Senate Judiciary Committee calendar for 2/15/2022
2022-01-11SenateRefer to Senate Judiciary Committee
2022-01-11SenateRecalled from Senate Finance, Ways & Means Committee
2021-12-21SenateSponsor(s) Added.
2021-04-12SenateReceived from House, refer to Senate Finance, Ways & Means Committee
2021-04-08HouseEngrossed; ready for transmission to Sen.
2021-04-08HouseSponsor(s) Added.
2021-04-08HouseAdopted, Ayes 53, Nays 34, PNV 4
2021-03-25HouseH. Placed on Regular Calendar for 4/8/21
2021-03-25HouseSponsor(s) Added.
2021-03-25HouseReset on cal. for 4/8/2021
2021-03-22HouseSponsor(s) Added.
2021-03-15HouseReset on cal. for 3/25/2021
2021-03-15HouseSponsor(s) Added.
2021-03-11HouseSponsor(s) withdrawn.
2021-03-11HouseH. Placed on Regular Calendar for 3/15/2021
2021-03-10HousePlaced on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 3/11/2021
2021-03-09HouseRec. for pass; ref to Calendar & Rules Committee
2021-03-03HousePlaced on cal. State Government Committee for 3/9/2021
2021-03-03HouseRec. for pass by s/c ref. to State Government Committee
2021-03-01HouseSponsor(s) Added.
2021-02-24HousePlaced on s/c cal Public Service Subcommittee for 3/3/2021
2021-02-22HouseSponsor(s) Added.
2021-02-05HouseSponsor(s) Added.
2021-01-27HouseAssigned to s/c Public Service Subcommittee
2021-01-20HouseSponsor(s) Added.
2021-01-12HouseIntro., ref. to State Government Committee
2021-01-06HouseFiled for introduction

Subjects


Tennessee State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback