TN HJR0004 | 2021-2022 | 112th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-1)
Status: Passed on March 25 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-03-25 - Signed by Governor.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-1)
Status: Passed on March 25 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-03-25 - Signed by Governor.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
Recognizes doulas as vital birth and community health workers.
Title
A RESOLUTION to recognize doulas as vital members of the childbirth team and acknowledge their positive effect on maternal and infant mortality disparities.
Sponsors
Sen. London Lamar [D] | Rep. John Clemmons [D] | Rep. Karen Camper [D] | Rep. Jesse Chism [D] |
Rep. Eddie Mannis [R] |
Roll Calls
2021-03-22 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: Motion to Adopt (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-15 - House - FLOOR VOTE: REGULAR CALENDAR MOTION TO ADOPT (Y: 86 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-15 - House - FLOOR VOTE: REGULAR CALENDAR MOTION TO ADOPT (Y: 86 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-03-25 | Signed by Governor. | |
2021-03-25 | House | Transmitted to Governor for his action. |
2021-03-24 | Senate | Signed by Senate Speaker |
2021-03-24 | House | Signed by H. Speaker |
2021-03-24 | House | Enrolled; ready for sig. of H. Speaker. |
2021-03-22 | Senate | Concurred, Ayes 32, Nays 0 |
2021-03-18 | Senate | Placed on Senate Consent Calendar for 3/22/2021 |
2021-03-18 | Senate | Received from House, refer to Senate Calendar Committee |
2021-03-16 | House | Engrossed; ready for transmission to Sen. |
2021-03-16 | Senate | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2021-03-15 | House | Adopted, Ayes 86, Nays 0, PNV 1 |
2021-03-15 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2021-03-11 | House | H. Placed on Regular Calendar for 3/15/2021 |
2021-03-10 | House | Placed on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 3/11/2021 |
2021-03-03 | House | Rec. for pass; ref to Calendar & Rules Committee |
2021-02-24 | House | Placed on cal. Health Committee for 3/3/2021 |
2021-02-23 | House | Rec. for pass by s/c ref. to Health Committee |
2021-02-17 | House | Placed on s/c cal Health Subcommittee for 2/23/2021 |
2021-02-16 | House | Meeting Canceled |
2021-02-10 | House | Placed on s/c cal Health Subcommittee for 2/16/2021 |
2021-01-27 | House | Assigned to s/c Health Subcommittee |
2021-01-12 | House | Intro., ref. to Health Committee |
2020-12-15 | House | Filed for introduction |