TN HJR0003 | 2021-2022 | 112th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on December 3 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-04-19 - Taken off notice for cal in s/c Finance, Ways, and Means Subcommittee of Finance, Ways, and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on December 3 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-04-19 - Taken off notice for cal in s/c Finance, Ways, and Means Subcommittee of Finance, Ways, and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
Proposes an amendment to Article XI, Section 5 of the Constitution of Tennessee, to allow for bingo games conducted by 501(c)(3) or 501(c)(19) organizations to meet a charitable, not for profit, or community service purpose.
Title
A RESOLUTION to propose an amendment to Article XI, Section 5 of the Constitution of Tennessee, to allow for bingo events to benefit certain organizations.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-04-13 - House - HOUSE STATE GOVERNMENT COMMITTEE: Rec. for pass; ref to Finance, Ways, and Means Committee (Y: 17 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-30 - House - HOUSE DEPARTMENTS & AGENCIES SUBCOMMITTEE: Rec. for pass by s/c ref. to State Government Committee (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-30 - House - HOUSE DEPARTMENTS & AGENCIES SUBCOMMITTEE: Rec. for pass by s/c ref. to State Government Committee (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-04-19 | House | Taken off notice for cal in s/c Finance, Ways, and Means Subcommittee of Finance, Ways, and Means Committee |
2022-04-13 | House | Placed on s/c cal Finance, Ways, and Means Subcommittee for 4/19/2022 |
2022-02-02 | House | Action Def. in s/c Finance, Ways, and Means Subcommittee to Constitutional Amendment Calendar |
2022-01-27 | House | Placed on s/c cal Finance, Ways, and Means Subcommittee for 2/2/2022 |
2021-04-21 | House | Action Def. in s/c Finance, Ways, and Means Subcommittee to Constitutional Amendment Calendar |
2021-04-14 | House | Placed on s/c cal Finance, Ways, and Means Subcommittee for 4/21/2021 |
2021-04-13 | House | Assigned to s/c Finance, Ways, and Means Subcommittee |
2021-04-13 | House | Rec. for pass; ref to Finance, Ways, and Means Committee |
2021-04-07 | House | Placed on cal. State Government Committee for 4/13/2021 |
2021-04-06 | House | Action def. in State Government Committee to 4/13/2021 |
2021-03-31 | House | Placed on cal. State Government Committee for 4/6/2021 |
2021-03-30 | House | Rec. for pass by s/c ref. to State Government Committee |
2021-03-24 | House | Placed on s/c cal Departments & Agencies Subcommittee for 3/30/2021 |
2021-03-23 | House | Action Def. in s/c Departments & Agencies Subcommittee to 3/30/2021 |
2021-03-17 | House | Placed on s/c cal Departments & Agencies Subcommittee for 3/23/2021 |
2021-01-27 | House | Assigned to s/c Departments & Agencies Subcommittee |
2021-01-12 | House | Intro., ref. to State Government Committee |
2020-12-03 | House | Filed for introduction |