TN HB9080 | 2021-2022 | 112th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on October 26 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-10-28 - P2C, ref. to Covid-19 Committee of Extraordinary Session III
Pending: House Covid-19 Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on October 26 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-10-28 - P2C, ref. to Covid-19 Committee of Extraordinary Session III
Pending: House Covid-19 Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, prohibits a licensing board or disciplinary subcommittee from taking any action against a physician's license based solely on the physician's recommendations to a patient regarding treatment for COVID-19 subject to certain conditions; prohibits a pharmacy from blocking or attempting to block a patient's access to COVID-19 treatments in certain circumstances. - Amends TCA Title 33; Title 53; Title 63 and Title 68.
Title
AN ACT to amend Tennessee Code Annotated, Title 33; Title 53; Title 63 and Title 68, relative to COVID-19.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-10-28 | House | P2C, ref. to Covid-19 Committee of Extraordinary Session III |
2021-10-27 | House | Intro., P1C. |
2021-10-27 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2021-10-26 | House | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
SB9086 (Crossfiled) 2021-10-28 - Placed on Senate Health and Welfare Committee calendar for 10/28/2021