TN HB9076 | 2021-2022 | 112th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 9-0)
Status: Passed on November 18 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-11-18 - Effective date(s) 11/12/2021
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 9-0)
Status: Passed on November 18 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-11-18 - Effective date(s) 11/12/2021
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, grants governor exclusive jurisdiction to issue orders and directives regarding county health departments during a pandemic; transfers authorization to order rules and regulations as are necessary or appropriate to protect the general health and safety of the county from the county health officer to the county mayor; revises and enacts other provisions regarding the powers and responsibilities of county health departments, county mayors, and county health officers. - Amends TCA Title 4; Title 14; Title 58; Title 68, Chapter 2 and Chapter 550 of the Public Acts of 2021.
Title
AN ACT to amend Tennessee Code Annotated, Title 4; Title 14; Title 58; Title 68, Chapter 2 and Chapter 550 of the Public Acts of 2021, relative to public health.
Sponsors
Rep. Cameron Sexton [R] | Rep. Kevin Vaughan [R] | Rep. Ryan Williams [R] | Rep. Bruce Griffey [R] |
Rep. Tom Leatherwood [R] | Rep. Jason Zachary [R] | Rep. Scott Cepicky [R] | Rep. Susan Lynn [R] |
Rep. Dan Howell [R] |
Roll Calls
2021-10-30 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: Motion to Adopt Conference Committee Report (Y: 22 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-10-30 - House - FLOOR VOTE: PREVIOUS QUESTION MOTION TO ADOPT CONFERENCE COMMITTEE REPORT (Y: 66 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-10-30 - House - FLOOR VOTE: MOTION TO ADOPT CONFERENCE COMMITTEE REPORT (Y: 67 N: 14 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-10-29 - House - FLOOR VOTE: REGULAR CALENDAR PREVIOUS QUESTION AS AMENDED PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 69 N: 23 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-10-29 - House - FLOOR VOTE: REGULAR CALENDAR MOTION TO CONSIDER AMENDMENT # 2 BY HARDAWAY PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 24 N: 69 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2021-10-29 - House - FLOOR VOTE: REGULAR CALENDAR AS AMENDED PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 67 N: 23 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-10-29 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: as Amended Third Consideration (Y: 25 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-10-30 - House - FLOOR VOTE: PREVIOUS QUESTION MOTION TO ADOPT CONFERENCE COMMITTEE REPORT (Y: 66 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-10-30 - House - FLOOR VOTE: MOTION TO ADOPT CONFERENCE COMMITTEE REPORT (Y: 67 N: 14 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-10-29 - House - FLOOR VOTE: REGULAR CALENDAR PREVIOUS QUESTION AS AMENDED PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 69 N: 23 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-10-29 - House - FLOOR VOTE: REGULAR CALENDAR MOTION TO CONSIDER AMENDMENT # 2 BY HARDAWAY PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 24 N: 69 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2021-10-29 - House - FLOOR VOTE: REGULAR CALENDAR AS AMENDED PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 67 N: 23 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-10-29 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: as Amended Third Consideration (Y: 25 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-11-18 | Effective date(s) 11/12/2021 | |
2021-11-18 | Pub. Ch. 4 | |
2021-11-12 | Returned by Governor without signature. | |
2021-11-01 | House | Transmitted to Governor for his action. |
2021-11-01 | Senate | Signed by Senate Speaker |
2021-11-01 | House | Signed by H. Speaker |
2021-11-01 | House | Enrolled; ready for sig. of H. Speaker. |
2021-10-30 | Senate | Conference Committee report adopted (CC9003) |
2021-10-30 | House | Conf. comm. report adopted, Ayes 67, Nays 14 PNV 1 |
2021-10-29 | Senate | Conference Committee appointed. (Massey, Jackson, Rose, Kyle, Gardenhire) |
2021-10-29 | House | Conf. comm. appointed. (Vaughan, Hazlewood, Grills, Windle) |
2021-10-29 | House | H. refused to recede from its non-concurrence in SA1 |
2021-10-29 | Senate | Senate refused to recede from its non-concurrence. |
2021-10-29 | House | H. nonconcurred in S. am. no. SA9006 HB9076 |
2021-10-29 | House | H. Placed on Message Calendar for 10/29/21 |
2021-10-29 | Senate | Passed Senate as amended, Ayes 25, Nays 6 |
2021-10-29 | Senate | Senate adopted Amendment (Amendment 1 - SA9006) |
2021-10-29 | Senate | Senate substituted House Bill for companion Senate Bill. |
2021-10-29 | Senate | Received from House, Passed on First Consideration |
2021-10-29 | House | Engrossed; ready for transmission to Sen. |
2021-10-29 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2021-10-29 | House | Passed H., as am., Ayes 67, Nays 23, PNV 2 |
2021-10-29 | House | H. adopted am. (Amendment 1 - HA9006) |
2021-10-28 | House | H. Placed on Regular Calendar |
2021-10-28 | House | Placed on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee of Extraordinary Session III for 10/28/2021 |
2021-10-28 | House | Rec. for pass. if am., ref. to Calendar & Rules Committee of Extraordinary Session III |
2021-10-28 | House | Placed on cal. Finance, Ways, and Means Committee of Extraordinary Session III for 10/28/2021 |
2021-10-28 | House | Placed on cal. Finance, Ways, and Means Committee of Extraordinary Session III for 10/28/2021 |
2021-10-28 | House | Rec. for pass; ref to Finance, Ways, and Means Committee of Extraordinary Session III |
2021-10-28 | House | Placed on cal. Public Health Committee of Extraordinary Session III for 10/28/2021 |
2021-10-28 | House | P2C, ref. to Public Health Committee of Extraordinary Session III |
2021-10-28 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2021-10-27 | House | Intro., P1C. |
2021-10-26 | House | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
SB9013 (Crossfiled) 2021-11-18 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 4