TN HB9075 | 2021-2022 | 112th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 10-0)
Status: Passed on November 18 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-11-18 - Effective date(s) 11/12/2021
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 10-0)
Status: Passed on November 18 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-11-18 - Effective date(s) 11/12/2021
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, decreases the time a state of emergency may continue under an executive order or proclamation issued by the governor from 60 days to 45 days. - Amends TCA Title 58, Chapter 2, Part 1.
Title
AN ACT to amend Tennessee Code Annotated, Title 58, Chapter 2, Part 1, relative to executive actions by the governor under the governor's emergency powers.
Sponsors
Rep. Cameron Sexton [R] | Rep. Michael Curcio [R] | Rep. Bruce Griffey [R] | Rep. Bud Hulsey [R] |
Rep. Chris Todd [R] | Rep. Ryan Williams [R] | Rep. Scott Cepicky [R] | Rep. Susan Lynn [R] |
Rep. John Ragan [R] | Rep. Dan Howell [R] |
Roll Calls
2021-10-29 - House - FLOOR VOTE: REGULAR CALENDAR PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 76 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-10-29 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: Third Consideration (Y: 24 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-10-29 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: Third Consideration (Y: 24 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-11-18 | Effective date(s) 11/12/2021 | |
2021-11-18 | Pub. Ch. 3 | |
2021-11-12 | Signed by Governor. | |
2021-11-01 | House | Transmitted to Governor for his action. |
2021-11-01 | Senate | Signed by Senate Speaker |
2021-11-01 | House | Signed by H. Speaker |
2021-11-01 | House | Enrolled; ready for sig. of H. Speaker. |
2021-10-29 | Senate | Passed Senate, Ayes 24, Nays 5 |
2021-10-29 | Senate | Senate substituted House Bill for companion Senate Bill. |
2021-10-29 | Senate | Received from House, Passed on First Consideration |
2021-10-29 | House | Engrossed; ready for transmission to Sen. |
2021-10-29 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2021-10-29 | House | Passed H., Ayes 76, Nays 14, PNV 0 |
2021-10-28 | House | H. Placed on Regular Calendar |
2021-10-28 | House | Placed on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee of Extraordinary Session III for 10/28/2021 |
2021-10-28 | House | Rec. for pass; ref to Calendar & Rules Committee of Extraordinary Session III |
2021-10-28 | House | Placed on cal. Emergency Orders Committee of Extraordinary Session III for 10/28/2021 |
2021-10-28 | House | P2C, ref. to Emergency Orders Committee of Extraordinary Session III |
2021-10-28 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2021-10-27 | House | Intro., P1C. |
2021-10-27 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2021-10-26 | House | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
SB9012 (Crossfiled) 2021-11-18 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 3