TN HB9074 | 2021-2022 | 112th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 6-0)
Status: Introduced on October 26 2021 - 25% progression
Action: 2021-10-29 - Held on desk.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]

Summary

As introduced, requires the attorney general and reporter to seek a writ of mandamus or injunction from a court of competent jurisdiction to compel a public official who knowingly refuses to enforce and execute the orders and rules issued in an emergency to do so; requires the attorney general and reporter to seek a civil penalty of no more than $10,000 for failure to enforce or execute emergency orders and rules and an additional $1,000 per day that the official refuses to comply with the writ of mandamus or injunction. - Amends TCA Title 8, Chapter 6 and Title 58, Chapter 2.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

AN ACT to amend Tennessee Code Annotated, Title 8, Chapter 6 and Title 58, Chapter 2, relative to executive actions regarding emergencies.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2021-10-29HouseHeld on desk.
2021-10-28HouseH. Placed on Regular Calendar
2021-10-28HousePlaced on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee of Extraordinary Session III for 10/28/2021
2021-10-28HouseRec. for pass; ref to Calendar & Rules Committee of Extraordinary Session III
2021-10-28HousePlaced on cal. Finance, Ways, and Means Committee of Extraordinary Session III for 10/28/2021
2021-10-28HousePlaced on cal. Finance, Ways, and Means Committee of Extraordinary Session III for 10/28/2021
2021-10-28HouseRec. for pass. if am., ref. to Finance, Ways, and Means Committee of Extraordinary Session III
2021-10-28HousePlaced on cal. Judiciary Committee of Extraordinary Session III for 10/28/2021
2021-10-28HouseP2C, ref. to Judiciary Committee of Extraordinary Session III
2021-10-27HouseIntro., P1C.
2021-10-26HouseFiled for introduction

Same As/Similar To

SB9011 (Crossfiled) 2021-10-29 - Failed in Senate State and Local Government Committee, Ayes 2, Nays 7

Subjects


Tennessee State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback