TN HB9056 | 2021-2022 | 112th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on October 26 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-10-28 - No Action Taken
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on October 26 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-10-28 - No Action Taken
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, authorizes up to 10 days of paid COVID-19 sick leave for full-time and part-time public school employees, including employees caring for a family member who has COVID-19 or who live with a person who has COVID-19; requires the department of education to amend its federal plan to include COVID-19 paid sick leave for early childhood program employees. - Amends TCA Title 49.
Title
AN ACT to amend Tennessee Code Annotated, Title 49, relative to a uniform standard for COVID-19 sick leave.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-10-28 | House | No Action Taken |
2021-10-28 | House | Placed on cal. Covid-19 Committee of Extraordinary Session III for 10/28/2021 |
2021-10-28 | House | P2C, ref. to Covid-19 Committee of Extraordinary Session III |
2021-10-27 | House | Intro., P1C. |
2021-10-26 | House | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
SB9049 (Crossfiled) 2021-10-28 - Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Education Committee