TN HB9045 | 2021-2022 | 112th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 5-0)
Status: Introduced on October 26 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-10-28 - P2C, ref. to Covid-19 Committee of Extraordinary Session III
Pending: House Covid-19 Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on October 26 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-10-28 - P2C, ref. to Covid-19 Committee of Extraordinary Session III
Pending: House Covid-19 Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, exempts any person who has previously been infected with COVID-19 from any public or private COVID-19 mandate; provides for a cause of action for any person unable to obtain an exemption after providing proof of prior COVID-19 infection. - Amends TCA Title 33; Title 50; Title 58; Title 63 and Title 68.
Title
AN ACT to amend Tennessee Code Annotated, Title 33; Title 50; Title 58; Title 63 and Title 68, relative to uniform standards for COVID-19.
Sponsors
Rep. John Ragan [R] | Rep. Terri Lynn Weaver [R] | Rep. Debra Moody [R] | Rep. Chris Todd [R] |
Rep. Tim Rudd [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-10-28 | House | P2C, ref. to Covid-19 Committee of Extraordinary Session III |
2021-10-27 | House | Intro., P1C. |
2021-10-26 | House | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
SB9068 (Crossfiled) 2021-10-28 - Placed on Senate Health and Welfare Committee calendar for 10/28/2021