TN HB9044 | 2021-2022 | 112th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 6-0)
Status: Introduced on October 26 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-10-28 - Taken off notice for cal. in Covid-19 Committee of Extraordinary Session III
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on October 26 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-10-28 - Taken off notice for cal. in Covid-19 Committee of Extraordinary Session III
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, prohibits the governor, an agency, a political subdivision, or a state-funded organization from mandating or coercing an applicant for employment, employee, or other person to wear a face covering that has not been prescribed by a licensed physician; includes exceptions for safety equipment, military gear, and penal institutions. - Amends TCA Title 4; Title 5; Title 6; Title 7; Title 8; Title 10; Title 11; Title 12; Title 41; Title 49; Title 50; Title 58 and Title 68.
Title
AN ACT to amend Tennessee Code Annotated, Title 4; Title 5; Title 6; Title 7; Title 8; Title 10; Title 11; Title 12; Title 41; Title 49; Title 50; Title 58 and Title 68, relative to uniform standards for persons subject to COVID-19 face covering requirements.
Sponsors
Rep. John Ragan [R] | Rep. Bruce Griffey [R] | Rep. Terri Lynn Weaver [R] | Rep. Debra Moody [R] |
Rep. Chris Todd [R] | Rep. Tim Rudd [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-10-28 | House | Taken off notice for cal. in Covid-19 Committee of Extraordinary Session III |
2021-10-28 | House | Placed on cal. Covid-19 Committee of Extraordinary Session III for 10/28/2021 |
2021-10-28 | House | P2C, ref. to Covid-19 Committee of Extraordinary Session III |
2021-10-27 | House | Intro., P1C. |
2021-10-26 | House | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
SB9067 (Crossfiled) 2021-10-28 - Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate State & Local Government Committee