TN HB9031 | 2021-2022 | 112th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 16-2)
Status: Introduced on October 26 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-10-28 - No Action Taken
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on October 26 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-10-28 - No Action Taken
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, prohibits a hospital or other licensed facility from restricting a pregnant patient from having a doula present with the patient during the stay in the hospital or facility as long as the doula tests negative for COVID-19 and is not exhibiting symptoms of COVID-19 or another virus or communicable disease. - Amends TCA Title 4; Title 29; Title 33; Title 56; Title 63; Title 68 and Title 71.
Title
AN ACT to amend Tennessee Code Annotated, Title 4; Title 29; Title 33; Title 56; Title 63; Title 68 and Title 71, relative to establishing uniform standards for COVID-19.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-10-28 | House | No Action Taken |
2021-10-28 | House | Placed on cal. Covid-19 Committee of Extraordinary Session III for 10/28/2021 |
2021-10-28 | House | P2C, ref. to Covid-19 Committee of Extraordinary Session III |
2021-10-28 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2021-10-27 | House | Intro., P1C. |
2021-10-26 | House | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
SB9047 (Crossfiled) 2021-10-28 - Placed on Senate Health and Welfare Committee calendar for 10/28/2021