TN HB9011 | 2021-2022 | 112th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on October 26 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-10-28 - Taken off notice for cal. in Covid-19 Committee of Extraordinary Session III
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on October 26 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-10-28 - Taken off notice for cal. in Covid-19 Committee of Extraordinary Session III
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, creates a private cause of action for any person who suffers an adverse action by another due to the person's religious objection to receiving the COVID-19 vaccine. - Amends TCA Title 4, Chapter 21 and Title 68.
Title
AN ACT to amend Tennessee Code Annotated, Title 4, Chapter 21 and Title 68, relative to uniform standards regarding COVID-19 vaccinations.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-10-28 | House | Taken off notice for cal. in Covid-19 Committee of Extraordinary Session III |
2021-10-28 | House | Placed on cal. Covid-19 Committee of Extraordinary Session III for 10/28/2021 |
2021-10-28 | House | P2C, ref. to Covid-19 Committee of Extraordinary Session III |
2021-10-27 | House | Intro., P1C. |
2021-10-26 | House | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
SB9036 (Crossfiled) 2021-10-28 - Reset on Final calendar of Senate Judiciary Committee