TN HB9009 | 2021-2022 | 112th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on October 26 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-10-28 - Taken off notice for cal. in Covid-19 Committee of Extraordinary Session III
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on October 26 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-10-28 - Taken off notice for cal. in Covid-19 Committee of Extraordinary Session III
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, prohibits state funds from being appropriated or disbursed to or expended by a public or private entity that implements a COVID-19 vaccination or mask-wearing requirement as a condition of entry; requires the department of finance and administration to recoup state funds previously appropriated or disbursed to a public or private entity that has implemented such a requirement. - Amends TCA Title 4; Title 9, Chapter 1 and Title 9, Chapter 4, Part 51.
Title
AN ACT to amend Tennessee Code Annotated, Title 4; Title 9, Chapter 1 and Title 9, Chapter 4, Part 51, relative to entities that receive state grant funds that implement COVID-19 restrictions.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-10-28 | House | Taken off notice for cal. in Covid-19 Committee of Extraordinary Session III |
2021-10-28 | House | Placed on cal. Covid-19 Committee of Extraordinary Session III for 10/28/2021 |
2021-10-28 | House | P2C, ref. to Covid-19 Committee of Extraordinary Session III |
2021-10-27 | House | Intro., P1C. |
2021-10-26 | House | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
SB9041 (Crossfiled) 2021-10-28 - Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate State and Local Government Committee