TN HB8005 | 2019-2020 | 111th General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 57-0)
Status: Passed on August 27 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-08-27 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 3
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

As enacted, revises certain criminal laws concerning vandalism, assault, disorderly conduct, rioting, obstructing traffic, camping on state property, and other offenses; authorizes the TBI to investigate certain offenses; requires the district attorneys general conference to make a report to the general assembly. - Amends TCA Title 8; Title 38; Title 39 and Title 40.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

As enacted, revises certain criminal laws concerning vandalism, assault, disorderly conduct, rioting, obstructing traffic, camping on state property, and other offenses; authorizes the TBI to investigate certain offenses; requires the district attorneys general conference to make a report to the general assembly. - Amends TCA Title 8; Title 38; Title 39 and Title 40.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-08-12 - House - FINANCE, WAYS, AND MEANS COMMITTEE OF EXTRAORDINARY SESSION II: (Y: 18 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-08-27 Comp. became Pub. Ch. 3
2020-08-12HouseComp. SB subst.
2020-08-12HouseH. Placed on Regular Calendar for 8/12/2020
2020-08-12HouseRec. for pass; ref to Calendar & Rules Committee of Extraordinary Session II
2020-08-12HousePlaced on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee of Extraordinary Session II for 8/12/2020
2020-08-12HouseRec. for pass. if am., ref. to Calendar & Rules Committee of Extraordinary Session II
2020-08-12HousePlaced on cal. Finance, Ways, and Means Committee of Extraordinary Session II for 8/12/2020
2020-08-11HouseRec. for pass. if am., ref. to Finance, Ways, and Means Committee of Extraordinary Session II
2020-08-11HousePlaced on cal. Public Safety Committee of Extraordinary Session II for 8/11/2020
2020-08-11HouseP2C, ref. to Public Safety Committee
2020-08-10HouseIntro., P1C.
2020-08-07HouseFiled for introduction

Same As/Similar To

SB8005 (Crossfiled) 2020-08-27 - Pub. Ch. 3

Subjects


Tennessee State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://wapp.capitol.tn.gov/apps/Billinfo/default.aspx?BillNumber=HB8005&ga=111
Texthttp://www.capitol.tn.gov/Bills/111/Bill/HB8005.pdf
Texthttp://publications.tnsosfiles.com/acts/111/2nd Extraordinary Session/pc0003EOS.pdf
Amendmenthttp://www.capitol.tn.gov/Bills/111/Amend/HA8001.pdf
Amendmenthttp://www.capitol.tn.gov/Bills/111/Amend/HA8006.pdf
Amendmenthttp://www.capitol.tn.gov/Bills/111/Amend/HA8007.pdf
Amendmenthttp://www.capitol.tn.gov/Bills/111/Amend/HA8008.pdf
Amendmenthttp://www.capitol.tn.gov/Bills/111/Amend/HA8009.pdf
Amendmenthttp://www.capitol.tn.gov/Bills/111/Amend/HA8015.pdf
Supplementhttp://www.capitol.tn.gov/Bills/111/Fiscal/HB8005.pdf
Supplementhttp://www.capitol.tn.gov/Bills/111/Fiscal/FM2919.pdf
Supplementhttp://www.capitol.tn.gov/Bills/111/Fiscal/FM2920.pdf
Supplementhttp://www.capitol.tn.gov/Bills/111/Fiscal/FM2925.pdf
Supplementhttp://www.capitol.tn.gov/Bills/111/Fiscal/FM2926.pdf
Roll Callhttp://wapp.capitol.tn.gov/apps/Billinfo/default.aspx?BillNumber=HB8005&ga=111

Bill Comments

feedback