TN HB8004 | 2019-2020 | 111th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on August 7 2020 - 25% progression
Action: 2020-08-11 - Taken off notice for cal. in Public Safety Committee of Extraordinary Session II
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]

Summary

As introduced, authorizes the Attorney General to initiate a criminal prosecution whenever the Attorney General receives information sufficient to constitute probable cause to investigate a violation of any state criminal law if the violation adversely impacted the rights of citizens to peaceful demonstrate. - Amends TCA Title 8; Title 38; Title 39 and Title 40.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

As introduced, authorizes the Attorney General to initiate a criminal prosecution whenever the Attorney General receives information sufficient to constitute probable cause to investigate a violation of any state criminal law if the violation adversely impacted the rights of citizens to peaceful demonstrate. - Amends TCA Title 8; Title 38; Title 39 and Title 40.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2020-08-11HouseTaken off notice for cal. in Public Safety Committee of Extraordinary Session II
2020-08-11HousePlaced on cal. Public Safety Committee of Extraordinary Session II for 8/11/2020
2020-08-11HouseP2C, ref. to Public Safety Committee
2020-08-10HouseIntro., P1C.
2020-08-07HouseFiled for introduction

Subjects


Tennessee State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback