TN HB8001 | 2021-2022 | 112th General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 36-15)
Status: Passed on November 18 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-11-18 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 1
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

As enacted, creates the Megasite Authority of West Tennessee. - Amends TCA Section 4-29-243; Section 4-29-244; Section 10-7-504; Title 64; Section 67-5-502 and Section 67-5-505.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

AN ACT to amend Tennessee Code Annotated, Section 4-29-243; Section 4-29-244; Section 10-7-504; Title 64; Section 67-5-502 and Section 67-5-505, relative to the Megasite Authority of West Tennessee Act of 2021.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2021-11-18 Comp. became Pub. Ch. 1
2021-10-20HouseComp. SB subst.
2021-10-20HouseH. Placed on Regular Calendar for 10/20/21
2021-10-20HousePlaced on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee of Extraordinary Session II for 10/20/2021
2021-10-20HouseRec. for pass. if am., ref. to Calendar & Rules Committee of Extraordinary Session II
2021-10-19HousePlaced on cal. Finance, Ways, and Means Committee of Extraordinary Session II for 10/19/2021
2021-10-19HouseRec. for pass. if am., ref. to Finance, Ways, and Means Committee of Extraordinary Session II
2021-10-19HousePlaced on cal. Commerce Committee of Extraordinary Session II for 10/19/2021
2021-10-19HouseP2C, ref. to Commerce Committee of Extraordinary Session II
2021-10-18HouseIntro., P1C.
2021-10-15HouseFiled for introduction

Same As/Similar To

SB8001 (Crossfiled) 2021-11-18 - Pub. Ch. 1

Subjects


Tennessee State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://wapp.capitol.tn.gov/apps/Billinfo/default.aspx?BillNumber=HB8001&ga=112
Texthttps://www.capitol.tn.gov/Bills/112/Bill/HB8001.pdf
Texthttps://publications.tnsosfiles.com/acts/112/extra/pc8001.pdf
Amendmenthttps://www.capitol.tn.gov/Bills/112/Amend/HA8001.pdf
Amendmenthttps://www.capitol.tn.gov/Bills/112/Amend/HA8007.pdf
Amendmenthttps://www.capitol.tn.gov/Bills/112/Amend/HA8008.pdf
Amendmenthttps://www.capitol.tn.gov/Bills/112/Amend/HA8009.pdf
Amendmenthttps://www.capitol.tn.gov/Bills/112/Amend/HA8010.pdf
Amendmenthttps://www.capitol.tn.gov/Bills/112/Amend/HA8011.pdf
Amendmenthttps://www.capitol.tn.gov/Bills/112/Amend/HA8012.pdf
Supplementhttps://www.capitol.tn.gov/Bills/112/Fiscal/HB8001.pdf
Supplementhttps://www.capitol.tn.gov/Bills/112/Fiscal/FM1339.pdf
Supplementhttps://www.capitol.tn.gov/Bills/112/Fiscal/FM1352.pdf
Supplementhttps://www.capitol.tn.gov/Bills/112/Fiscal/FM1353.pdf
Supplementhttps://www.capitol.tn.gov/Bills/112/Fiscal/FM1356.pdf
Supplementhttps://www.capitol.tn.gov/Bills/112/Fiscal/FM1357.pdf

Bill Comments

feedback