TN HB8001 | 2019-2020 | 111th General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 62-1)
Status: Passed on August 20 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-08-20 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 1
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

As enacted, enacts "Tennessee COVID-19 Recovery Act." - Amends TCA Title 9, Chapter 8, Part 3; Title 29, Chapter 34; Title 29, Chapter 20 and Title 49, Chapter 7, Part 1.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

As enacted, enacts "Tennessee COVID-19 Recovery Act." - Amends TCA Title 9, Chapter 8, Part 3; Title 29, Chapter 34; Title 29, Chapter 20 and Title 49, Chapter 7, Part 1.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2020-08-20 Comp. became Pub. Ch. 1
2020-08-12HouseComp. SB subst.
2020-08-12HouseH. Placed on Regular Calendar for 8/12/2020
2020-08-12HouseRec. for pass; ref to Calendar & Rules Committee of Extraordinary Session II
2020-08-12HousePlaced on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee of Extraordinary Session II for 8/12/2020
2020-08-11HouseRec. for pass. if am., ref. to Calendar & Rules Committee of Extraordinary Session II
2020-08-11HousePlaced on cal. COVID Related Liability Committee of Extraordinary Session II for 8/11/2020
2020-08-11HouseP2C, ref. to COVID Related Liability Committee
2020-08-10HouseIntro., P1C.
2020-08-07HouseFiled for introduction

Same As/Similar To

SB8002 (Crossfiled) 2020-08-20 - Pub. Ch. 1

Subjects


Tennessee State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback