TN HB7105 | 2023-2024 | 113th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on August 21 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2023-08-25 - Assigned to s/c Criminal Justice Subcommittee of 1st Extraordinary Session
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]

Summary

As introduced, requires the administrative office of the courts to ensure that certain courts accurately, completely, and timely submit relevant information to the TBI to be included in databases used to check a person's criminal history; requires the TBI to review all databases of criminal history background information maintained by the TBI to determine how the process for submitting information to databases could be improved and submit a report by January 1, 2024, to the governor and the speakers of the senate and the house of representatives that identifies any barriers to such reporting of information. - Amends TCA Title 16; Title 18; Title 33; Title 37; Title 38 and Title 39.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

AN ACT to amend Tennessee Code Annotated, Title 16; Title 18; Title 33; Title 37; Title 38 and Title 39, relative to records.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2023-08-25HouseAssigned to s/c Criminal Justice Subcommittee of 1st Extraordinary Session
2023-08-24HouseP2C, ref. to Criminal Justice Committee of 1st Extraordinary Session
2023-08-22HouseSponsor(s) Added.
2023-08-22HouseIntro., P1C.
2023-08-21HouseFiled for introduction

Subjects


Tennessee State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback