TN HB7096 | 2023-2024 | 113th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on August 18 2023 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-08-22 - Taken off notice for cal in s/c K-12 Subcommittee of Education Administration
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]

Summary

As introduced, requires the department of education to establish a school bulletproofing grant program to provide grants to public schools located in counties with a crime rate of 13 percent or higher for violent offenses, for the purpose of offsetting expenses for the installation of bulletproof film on doors and windows. - Amends TCA Title 9; Title 49; Title 67 and Chapter 367 of the Public Acts of 2023.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

AN ACT to amend Tennessee Code Annotated, Title 9; Title 49; Title 67 and Chapter 367 of the Public Acts of 2023, relative to educational expenses for school safety plans.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2023-08-22HouseTaken off notice for cal in s/c K-12 Subcommittee of Education Administration
2023-08-22HousePlaced on s/c cal K-12 Subcommittee for 8/22/2023
2023-08-22HouseAssigned to s/c K-12 Subcommittee
2023-08-22HouseP2C, ref. to Education Administration -- Governmenrt Operations for Review
2023-08-21HouseIntro., P1C.
2023-08-18HouseFiled for introduction

Same As/Similar To

SB7050 (Crossfiled) 2023-08-23 - Lay on the Table

Subjects


Tennessee State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback