TN HB7089 | 2023-2024 | 113th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on August 18 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2023-08-22 - Taken off notice for cal in s/c Criminal Justice Subcommittee of Criminal Justice Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]

Summary

As introduced, requires that a law enforcement officer detain a person for mental health examination prior to issuing a charge or arrest if the officer has reason to believe the person is subject to detention for the purpose of examination for certification of need for care and treatment. - Amends TCA Title 33; Title 38; Title 39 and Title 40.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

AN ACT to amend Tennessee Code Annotated, Title 33; Title 38; Title 39 and Title 40, relative to mental health of a detainee.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2023-08-22HouseTaken off notice for cal in s/c Criminal Justice Subcommittee of Criminal Justice Committee
2023-08-22HousePlaced on s/c cal Criminal Justice Subcommittee for 8/22/2023
2023-08-22HouseAssigned to s/c Criminal Justice Subcommittee
2023-08-22HouseP2C, ref. to Criminal Justice Committee
2023-08-21HouseIntro., P1C.
2023-08-18HouseFiled for introduction

Same As/Similar To

SB7069 (Crossfiled) 2023-08-22 - Lay on the Table

Subjects


Tennessee State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback