TN HB7086 | 2023-2024 | 113th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Introduced on August 18 2023 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-08-23 - Taken off notice for cal. in Civil Justice Committee of 1st Extraordinary Session
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]

Summary

As introduced, authorizes a faculty or staff member of a school to carry a concealed handgun on school grounds subject to certain conditions, including obtaining an enhanced handgun carry permit and completing basic training in school policing. - Amends TCA Section 49-6-815.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

AN ACT to amend Tennessee Code Annotated, Section 49-6-815, relative to school safety.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2023-08-23HouseTaken off notice for cal. in Civil Justice Committee of 1st Extraordinary Session
2023-08-22HousePlaced on cal. Civil Justice Committee for 8/23/2023
2023-08-22HouseRec. for pass by s/c ref. to Civil Justice Committee
2023-08-22HouseSponsor(s) Added.
2023-08-22HousePlaced on s/c cal Civil Justice Subcommittee for 8/22/2023
2023-08-22HouseAssigned to s/c Civil Justice Subcommittee
2023-08-22HouseP2C, ref. to Civil Justice Committee -- Education Administration
2023-08-21HouseIntro., P1C.
2023-08-18HouseFiled for introduction

Same As/Similar To

SB7019 (Crossfiled) 2023-08-23 - Lay on the Table

Subjects


Tennessee State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback