TN HB7072 | 2023-2024 | 113th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 10-0)
Status: Engrossed on August 28 2023 - 50% progression
Action: 2023-08-29 - Received from House, Passed on First Consideration
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]

Summary

As introduced, directs the administrative office of the courts (AOC) to define and develop a centralized system of case management, document management, electronic case filing, electronic payment methods, data reporting, and any other capability deemed necessary for collection and reporting of all state and local court public case level data. - Amends TCA Title 8; Title 16 and Title 18.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

AN ACT to amend Tennessee Code Annotated, Title 8; Title 16 and Title 18, relative to court systems.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2023-08-28 - House - FLOOR VOTE: REGULAR CALENDAR PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 69 N: 17 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2023-08-29SenateReceived from House, Passed on First Consideration
2023-08-28HouseEngrossed; ready for transmission to Sen.
2023-08-28HouseSponsor(s) Added.
2023-08-28HousePassed H., Ayes 69, Nays 17, PNV 4
2023-08-24HouseSponsor(s) Added.
2023-08-24HouseH. Placed on Regular Calendar for 8/24/23
2023-08-24HousePlaced on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee of 1st Extraordinary Session for 8/24/2023
2023-08-23HouseRec. for pass; ref to Calendar & Rules Committee of 1st Extraordinary Session
2023-08-22HousePlaced on cal. Civil Justice Committee for 8/23/2023
2023-08-22HouseRec. for pass by s/c ref. to Civil Justice Committee
2023-08-22HousePlaced on s/c cal Civil Justice Subcommittee for 8/22/2023
2023-08-22HouseAssigned to s/c Civil Justice Subcommittee
2023-08-22HouseP2C, ref. to Civil Justice Committee
2023-08-21HouseIntro., P1C.
2023-08-18HouseFiled for introduction

Same As/Similar To

SB7007 (Crossfiled) 2023-08-22 - Lay on the Table

Subjects


Tennessee State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback