TN HB7069 | 2023-2024 | 113th General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Failed on August 22 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-08-22 - Failed in s/c Insurance Subcommittee of Insurance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]

Summary

As introduced, authorizes the governor to expand medicaid for mental health prevention and treatment pursuant to the federal Patient Protection and Affordable Care Act; authorizes the governor to negotiate with the federal centers for medicare and medicaid services to determine the terms of the expansion. - Amends TCA Title 4; Title 33 and Title 71.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

AN ACT to amend Tennessee Code Annotated, Title 4; Title 33 and Title 71, relative to expanding Medicaid to provide mental health services.

Sponsors


Roll Calls


History

DateChamberAction
2023-08-22HouseFailed in s/c Insurance Subcommittee of Insurance Committee
2023-08-22HouseSponsor(s) Added.
2023-08-22HousePlaced on s/c cal Insurance Subcommittee for 8/22/2023
2023-08-22HouseAssigned to s/c Insurance Subcommittee
2023-08-22HouseP2C, ref. to Insurance Committee
2023-08-21HouseIntro., P1C.
2023-08-18HouseFiled for introduction

Same As/Similar To

SB7074 (Crossfiled) 2023-08-23 - Lay on the Table

Subjects


Tennessee State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback