TN HB7056 | 2023-2024 | 113th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on August 18 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2023-08-22 - Tabled
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]

Summary

As introduced, expands the offense of aggravated stalking to include persons who purchase a semi-automatic rifle or attempt to use a semi-automatic rifle for the course and furtherance of stalking. - Amends TCA Title 36; Title 39; Chapter 349 of the Public Acts of 2023 and Chapter 413 of the Public Acts of 2023.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

AN ACT to amend Tennessee Code Annotated, Title 36; Title 39; Chapter 349 of the Public Acts of 2023 and Chapter 413 of the Public Acts of 2023, relative to stalking.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2023-08-22HouseTabled
2023-08-22HouseSponsor(s) Added.
2023-08-22HousePlaced on s/c cal Criminal Justice Subcommittee for 8/22/2023
2023-08-22HouseAssigned to s/c Criminal Justice Subcommittee
2023-08-22HouseP2C, ref. to Criminal Justice Committee
2023-08-21HouseIntro., P1C.
2023-08-18HouseFiled for introduction

Same As/Similar To

SB7049 (Crossfiled) 2023-08-22 - Lay on the Table

Subjects


Tennessee State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback