TN HB7049 | 2023-2024 | 113th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Introduced on August 18 2023 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-08-24 - Taken off notice for cal in s/c Finance, Ways, and Means Subcommittee of 1st Extraordinary Session of Finance, Ways, and Means Committee of 1st Extraordinary Session
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #3) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on August 18 2023 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-08-24 - Taken off notice for cal in s/c Finance, Ways, and Means Subcommittee of 1st Extraordinary Session of Finance, Ways, and Means Committee of 1st Extraordinary Session
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #3) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, creates the Class C felony of knowingly inducing or coercing a minor under 18 to commit theft of a firearm or a robbery or burglary offense involving theft of a firearm from a residence or motor vehicle. - Amends TCA Title 39 and Title 40.
Title
AN ACT to amend Tennessee Code Annotated, Title 39 and Title 40, relative to offenses related to inducing or coercing a minor to commit an offense.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-08-24 | House | Taken off notice for cal in s/c Finance, Ways, and Means Subcommittee of 1st Extraordinary Session of Finance, Ways, and Means Committee of 1st Extraordinary Session |
2023-08-24 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2023-08-23 | House | Placed on s/c cal Finance, Ways, and Means Subcommittee of 1st Extraordinary Session for 8/24/2023 |
2023-08-23 | House | Assigned to s/c Finance, Ways, and Means Subcommittee of 1st Extraordinary Session |
2023-08-23 | House | Rec. for pass; ref to Finance, Ways, and Means Committee of 1st Extraordinary Session |
2023-08-22 | House | Placed on cal. Criminal Justice Committee for 8/23/2023 |
2023-08-22 | House | Rec. for pass by s/c ref. to Criminal Justice Committee |
2023-08-22 | House | Sponsor change. |
2023-08-22 | House | Placed on s/c cal Criminal Justice Subcommittee for 8/22/2023 |
2023-08-22 | House | Assigned to s/c Criminal Justice Subcommittee |
2023-08-22 | House | P2C, ref. to Criminal Justice Committee |
2023-08-21 | House | Intro., P1C. |
2023-08-18 | House | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
SB7064 (Crossfiled) 2023-08-22 - Lay on the Table