TN HB7022 | 2023-2024 | 113th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on August 16 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2023-08-22 - Taken off notice for cal in s/c Criminal Justice Subcommittee of Criminal Justice Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]

Summary

As introduced, creates the Class E felony of threatening to commit an act of mass violence against another; classifies a violation of threats of mass violence as a hate crime, which must be punished one classification higher than otherwise provided, if the defendant threatened to commit the act of mass violence against the other person due to the person's status as a healthcare provider who performs abortions. - Amends TCA Title 39.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

AN ACT to amend Tennessee Code Annotated, Title 39, relative to mass violence.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2023-08-22HouseTaken off notice for cal in s/c Criminal Justice Subcommittee of Criminal Justice Committee
2023-08-22HouseSponsor(s) Added.
2023-08-22HousePlaced on s/c cal Criminal Justice Subcommittee for 8/22/2023
2023-08-22HouseAssigned to s/c Criminal Justice Subcommittee
2023-08-22HouseP2C, ref. to Criminal Justice Committee
2023-08-21HouseIntro., P1C.
2023-08-16HouseFiled for introduction

Same As/Similar To

SB7033 (Crossfiled) 2023-08-22 - Lay on the Table

Subjects


Tennessee State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback