TN HB7020 | 2021-2022 | 112th General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 15-0)
Status: Passed on February 9 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-02-09 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 4
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]

Summary

As introduced, makes appropriations sufficient to provide the first year's funding for any act which receives final passage during the first extraordinary session of the 112th General Assembly.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

AN ACT to make appropriations for the purpose of defraying the expenses of the state government for the fiscal years beginning July 1, 2020, and July 1, 2021, in the administration, operation, and maintenance of the legislative, executive, and judicial branches of the various departments, institutions, offices, and agencies of the state; for certain state aid and obligations; for capital outlay, for the service of the public debt, for emergency and contingency; to repeal certain appropriations and any acts inconsistent herewith; to provide provisional continuing appropriations; and to establish certain provisions, limitations, and restrictions under which appropriations may be obligated and expended. This act makes appropriations for the purposes described above for the fiscal years beginning July 1, 2020, and July 1, 2021.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2021-02-09 Comp. became Pub. Ch. 4
2021-01-22HouseComp. SB subst.
2021-01-21HouseH. Placed on Regular Calendar for 1/22/21
2021-01-21HousePlaced on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee of Extraordinary Session for 1/21/2021
2021-01-21HouseRec. for pass. if am., ref. to Calendar & Rules Committee of Extraordinary Session
2021-01-21HousePlaced on cal. Finance, Ways, and Means Committee of Extraordinary Session for 1/21/2021
2021-01-21HouseRe-ref. Finance, Ways, and Means Committee of Extraordinary Session
2021-01-21HouseH. Placed on Regular Calendar for 1/21/21
2021-01-21HousePlaced on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee of Extraordinary Session for 1/21/2021
2021-01-21HouseRec. for pass; ref to Calendar & Rules Committee of Extraordinary Session
2021-01-20HousePlaced on cal. Finance, Ways, and Means Committee of Extraordinary Session for 1/21/2021
2021-01-20HouseP2C, ref. to Finance, Ways, and Means Committee
2021-01-19HouseIntro., P1C.
2021-01-15HouseFiled for introduction

Same As/Similar To

SB7009 (Crossfiled) 2021-02-09 - Pub. Ch. 4

Subjects


Tennessee State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback