TN HB7019 | 2021-2022 | 112th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 21-0)
Status: Introduced on January 15 2021 - 25% progression
Action: 2021-01-20 - No Action Taken
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]

Summary

As introduced, authorizes a local board of education or charter school governing body to adopt policies and procedures relative to COVID-19 quarantining; requires a claimant alleging loss, damage, injury, or death caused by or resulting from a policy adopted by a local board or charter school governing body to prove by clear and convincing evidence that the board or governing body caused the injury by an act or omission constituting gross negligence or willful misconduct. - Amends TCA Title 29, Chapter 34; Title 49; Title 58, Chapter 2 and Title 68.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

AN ACT to amend Tennessee Code Annotated, Title 29, Chapter 34; Title 49; Title 58, Chapter 2 and Title 68, relative to COVID-19 exposure.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2021-01-20HouseNo Action Taken
2021-01-20HousePlaced on cal. Education 12 of Extraordinary Session for 1/20/2021
2021-01-20HouseP2C, ref. to Education 12 Committee
2021-01-19HouseIntro., P1C.
2021-01-15HouseFiled for introduction

Same As/Similar To

SB7017 (Crossfiled) 2021-01-20 - Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate Education Committee

Subjects


Tennessee State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback