TN HB7008 | 2021-2022 | 112th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 15 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-01-20 - Returned to the Clerk's Desk.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 15 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-01-20 - Returned to the Clerk's Desk.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, requires, subject to appropriation, the state to fund a 4 percent increase to LEAs' instructional salaries components in the 2020-2021 school year, which must be used solely to fund an increase in teacher salaries for that school year; provides that teachers must receive back pay from the beginning of the school year; prohibits an LEA from reducing a teacher's salary from one school year to the next, except in the case of a reduction in the teacher's duties. - Amends TCA Title 49.
Title
AN ACT to amend Tennessee Code Annotated, Title 49, relative to teacher pay.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-01-20 | House | Returned to the Clerk's Desk. |
2021-01-20 | House | Placed on cal. Education 345 of Extraordinary Session for 1/20/2021 |
2021-01-20 | House | P2C, ref. to Education 345 Committee |
2021-01-19 | House | Intro., P1C. |
2021-01-15 | House | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
SB7011 (Crossfiled) 2021-01-20 - Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate Education Committee