TN HB7004 | 2021-2022 | 112th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 24-0)
Status: Passed on February 9 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-02-09 - Effective date(s) 02/0/2021; 07/01/2022
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 24-0)
Status: Passed on February 9 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-02-09 - Effective date(s) 02/0/2021; 07/01/2022
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, enacts the "Tennessee Learning Loss Remediation and Student Acceleration Act"; requires local education agencies and public charter schools to implement a program of after-school learning mini-camps, learning loss bridge camps, and summer learning camps to remediate student learning loss. - Amends TCA Title 49, Chapter 6.
Title
AN ACT to amend Tennessee Code Annotated, Title 49, Chapter 6, relative to the Tennessee Learning Loss Remediation and Student Acceleration Act.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-01-22 - House - FLOOR VOTE: MESSAGE CALENDAR 1,3 & 4 CONCUR IN SENATE AMENDMENTS (Y: 88 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-21 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: Third Consideration, as amended (Y: 24 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-21 - House - FLOOR VOTE: REGULAR CALENDAR AS AMENDED PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 70 N: 21 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-21 - House - FLOOR VOTE: REGULAR CALENDAR PREVIOUS QUESTION AS AMENDED PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 66 N: 24 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-21 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: Third Consideration, as amended (Y: 24 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-21 - House - FLOOR VOTE: REGULAR CALENDAR AS AMENDED PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 70 N: 21 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-21 - House - FLOOR VOTE: REGULAR CALENDAR PREVIOUS QUESTION AS AMENDED PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 66 N: 24 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-02-09 | Effective date(s) 02/0/2021; 07/01/2022 | |
2021-02-09 | Pub. Ch. 1 | |
2021-02-03 | Signed by Governor. | |
2021-01-27 | House | Transmitted to Governor for his action. |
2021-01-26 | Senate | Signed by Senate Speaker |
2021-01-26 | House | Signed by H. Speaker |
2021-01-25 | House | Enrolled; ready for sig. of H. Speaker. |
2021-01-22 | House | H. concurred in S. am. no. Ayes 88, Nays 2 PNV 0 HB7004 |
2021-01-21 | House | H. Placed on Message Calendar for 1-22-21 |
2021-01-21 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2021-01-21 | Senate | Passed Senate as amended, Ayes 23, Nays 4 |
2021-01-21 | Senate | Amendment withdrawn. (Amendment 5 - SA0009) |
2021-01-21 | Senate | Senate adopted Amendment (Amendment 4 - SA0008) |
2021-01-21 | Senate | Senate adopted Amendment (Amendment 3 - SA0007) |
2021-01-21 | Senate | Amendment withdrawn. (Amendment 2 - SA0006) |
2021-01-21 | Senate | Senate adopted Amendment (Amendment 1 - SA0004) |
2021-01-21 | Senate | Senate substituted House Bill for companion Senate Bill. |
2021-01-21 | Senate | Received from House, Passed on First Consideration |
2021-01-21 | House | Engrossed; ready for transmission to Sen. |
2021-01-21 | House | Passed H., as am., Ayes 70, Nays 21, PNV 0 |
2021-01-21 | House | H. adopted am. (Amendment 3 - HA7004) |
2021-01-21 | House | Am. withdrawn. (Amendment 2 - HA7002) |
2021-01-21 | House | H. adopted am. (Amendment 1 - HA7001) |
2021-01-21 | House | H. Placed on Regular Calendar |
2021-01-21 | House | Placed on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee of Extraordinary Session for 1/21/2021 |
2021-01-21 | House | Rec. for pass. if am., ref. to Calendar & Rules Committee of Extraordinary Session |
2021-01-20 | House | Placed on cal. Finance, Ways, and Means Committee of Extraordinary Session for 1/21/2021 |
2021-01-20 | House | Rec. for pass; ref to Finance, Ways, and Means Committee of Extraordinary Session |
2021-01-20 | House | Placed on cal. Government Operations of Extraordinary Session for 1/20/2021 |
2021-01-20 | House | Rec. for pass. if am., ref. to Government Operations of Extraordinary Session |
2021-01-20 | House | Placed on cal. Education 12 of Extraordinary Session for 1/20/2021 |
2021-01-20 | House | P2C, ref. to Education 12 Committee-- Government Operations for Review |
2021-01-19 | House | Intro., P1C. |
2021-01-15 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2021-01-15 | House | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
SB7002 (Crossfiled) 2021-02-09 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 1