TN HB7001 | 2021-2022 | 112th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Introduced on January 14 2021 - 25% progression
Action: 2021-01-21 - Def. to Summer Study in Finance Tax of Extraordinary Session
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]

Summary

As introduced, imposes fees on certain money transmissions originating in this state to a location outside of the United States or its territories; requires that funds generated from collection of fees be used to fund salary increases for teachers and other educational staff. - Amends TCA Title 9; Title 38; Title 45, Chapter 7; Title 49 and Title 67.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

AN ACT to amend Tennessee Code Annotated, Title 9; Title 38; Title 45, Chapter 7; Title 49 and Title 67, relative to funding salary increases for teachers and other educational staff.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2021-01-21HouseDef. to Summer Study in Finance Tax of Extraordinary Session
2021-01-20HousePlaced on cal. Finance Tax of Extraordinary Session for 1/21/2021
2021-01-20HouseP2C, ref. to Finance Tax Committee -- Government Operations for Review
2021-01-19HouseIntro., P1C.
2021-01-14HouseFiled for introduction

Same As/Similar To

SB0203 (Crossfiled) 2021-04-21 - Pub. Ch. 116
SB7022 (Crossfiled) 2021-01-21 - Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Education Committee

Subjects


Tennessee State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback