TN HB3989 | 2009-2010 | 106th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 23 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-07-06 - Pr. Ch. 76
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 23 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-07-06 - Pr. Ch. 76
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, subject to local approval, revises municipal court language to comply with election requirements for municipal court having concurrent jurisdiction with the general sessions court. - Amends Chapter 669 of the Private Acts of.
Title
As introduced, subject to local approval, revises municipal court language to comply with election requirements for municipal court having concurrent jurisdiction with the general sessions court. - Amends Chapter 669 of the Private Acts of.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2010-06-03 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-07-06 | Pr. Ch. 76 | |
2010-06-23 | Signed by Governor. | |
2010-06-11 | Transmitted to Governor for his action. | |
2010-06-09 | Signed by S. Speaker | |
2010-06-09 | Signed by H. Speaker | |
2010-06-08 | Enrolled; ready for sig. of H. Speaker. | |
2010-06-03 | Passed S., Ayes 32, Nays 0 | |
2010-06-03 | S. Subst. HB for comp. SB. | |
2010-05-27 | Rcvd. from H., P1C. | |
2010-05-27 | Engrossed; ready for transmission to Sen. | |
2010-05-27 | Passed H., Ayes 95, Nays 0 | |
2010-05-24 | H. Placed on Regular Calendar for 5/27/10 | |
2010-05-24 | Objected to on Consent Calendar. | |
2010-05-20 | H. Placed on Consent Calendar for 5/24/10 | |
2010-04-08 | P2C held on desk. | |
2010-04-07 | Intro., P1C. | |
2010-04-06 | Filed for intro. |
Same As/Similar To
SB3942 (Crossfiled) 2010-07-06 - Comp. became Pr. Ch. 76