TN HB3965 | 2009-2010 | 106th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 9 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-04-20 - Pr. Ch. 45
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 9 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-04-20 - Pr. Ch. 45
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, subject to local approval, increases the hotel/motel tax from 5 percent to 7 percent. - Amends Chapter 354 of the Private Acts of 1982.
Title
As introduced, subject to local approval, increases the hotel/motel tax from 5 percent to 7 percent. - Amends Chapter 354 of the Private Acts of 1982.
Sponsors
Rep. John Litz [D] |
Roll Calls
2010-03-16 - House - STATE & LOCAL GOVERNMENT COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage - refer to: Calendar & Rules Committee (Y: 9 N: 6 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-04-20 | Pr. Ch. 45 | |
2010-04-09 | Signed by Governor. | |
2010-04-06 | Transmitted to Governor for his action. | |
2010-04-05 | Signed by S. Speaker | |
2010-04-01 | Signed by H. Speaker | |
2010-03-31 | Enrolled; ready for sig. of H. Speaker. | |
2010-03-31 | Passed S., Ayes 30, Nays 0 | |
2010-03-31 | S. Subst. HB for comp. SB. | |
2010-03-24 | Rcvd. from H., P1C. | |
2010-03-22 | Engrossed; ready for transmission to Sen. | |
2010-03-22 | Passed H., Ayes 76, Nays14, PNV 4 | |
2010-03-18 | Placed on Regular Calendar for 3/22/2010 | |
2010-03-17 | Placed on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 03/18/2010 | |
2010-03-16 | Rec. For Pass. ref. to: Calendar & Rules Committee | |
2010-03-10 | Placed on cal. State & Local Government Committee for 03/16/2010 | |
2010-03-10 | Rec. For Pass. by s/c ref. to State & Local Government Committee | |
2010-03-09 | Placed on s/c cal Local Government of S&LG for 03/10/2010 | |
2010-03-08 | Assigned to s/c Local Government of S&LG | |
2010-03-08 | Objected to on Consent Calendar. | |
2010-03-04 | H. Placed on Consent Calendar for 3/08/10 | |
2010-02-25 | P2C held on desk. | |
2010-02-22 | P1C. | |
2010-02-18 | Filed for intro. |
Same As/Similar To
SB3921 (Crossfiled) 2010-04-20 - Comp. became Pr. Ch. 45