TN HB3787 | 2009-2010 | 106th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 6 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-07-06 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 1134
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 6 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-07-06 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 1134
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, modifies various tax provisions, including provisions governing sales for resale, captive REITS, brownfield property and job tax credits; establishes tax relief in regard to certain flood-damaged property. - Amends TCA Title 7; Title 55; Title 56; Title 67 and Title 71, Chapter 602 of the Public Acts of 2007; and Chapter 530 of the Public Acts of 2009.
Title
As enacted, modifies various tax provisions, including provisions governing sales for resale, captive REITS, brownfield property and job tax credits; establishes tax relief in regard to certain flood-damaged property. - Amends TCA Title 7; Title 55; Title 56; Title 67 and Title 71, Chapter 602 of the Public Acts of 2007; and Chapter 530 of the Public Acts of 2009.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-07-06 | Comp. became Pub. Ch. 1134 | |
2010-06-04 | Comp. SB subst. | |
2010-06-03 | H. Placed on Regular Calendar for 6/04/10 | |
2010-06-03 | Reset on Reg cal. for 6/04/10 | |
2010-06-03 | H. Placed on Regular Calendar #3 for 6/03/10 | |
2010-06-03 | Placed on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 06/04/2010 | |
2010-06-03 | Rec. for Pass. if Am. ref. to: Calendar & Rules Committee | |
2010-06-02 | Action Def. in Finance, Ways & Means Committee to 6/2/2010 | |
2010-06-02 | Placed on cal. Finance, Ways & Means Committee for 06/02/2010 | |
2010-06-01 | Rec. for pass. if am. by s/c ref. to Finance, Ways & Means Committee | |
2010-05-28 | Placed on s/c cal Budget of FW&M for 06/04/2010 | |
2010-02-09 | Assigned to s/c Budget of FW&M | |
2010-02-08 | P2C, ref. to Finance, Ways & Means Committee | |
2010-02-04 | Intro., P1C. | |
2010-02-02 | Filed for intro. |
Same As/Similar To
SB3901 (Crossfiled) 2010-07-06 - Pub. Ch. 1134
Subjects
Tennessee State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://wapp.capitol.tn.gov/apps/Billinfo/default.aspx?BillNumber=HB3787&ga=106 |
Text | https://www.capitol.tn.gov/Bills/106/Bill/HB3787.pdf |