TN HB3671 | 2011-2012 | 107th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 29 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-05-29 - Pub. Ch. 1055
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 29 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-05-29 - Pub. Ch. 1055
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, revises provisions governing compensation to exonerated persons. - Amends TCA Title 9, Chapter 8, Part 1.
Title
As enacted, revises provisions governing compensation to exonerated persons. - Amends TCA Title 9, Chapter 8, Part 1.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2012-05-01 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: THIRD CONSIDERATION AMENDED (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-04-30 - House - FLOOR VOTE: AS AMENDED PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 80 N: 8 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-04-12 - House - (VOICE VOTE) CALENDAR & RULES COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage - refer to: House Regular Calendar 1 (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2012-03-21 - House - (VOICE VOTE) S&LG SUBCOMMITTEE: Recommended for passage - refer to: State & Local Government Committee (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2012-04-30 - House - FLOOR VOTE: AS AMENDED PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 80 N: 8 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-04-12 - House - (VOICE VOTE) CALENDAR & RULES COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage - refer to: House Regular Calendar 1 (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2012-03-21 - House - (VOICE VOTE) S&LG SUBCOMMITTEE: Recommended for passage - refer to: State & Local Government Committee (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-05-29 | Pub. Ch. 1055 | |
2012-05-29 | Effective date(s) 05/21/12 | |
2012-05-21 | Signed by Governor. | |
2012-05-09 | Transmitted to Governor for his action. | |
2012-05-08 | Signed by S. Speaker | |
2012-05-03 | Signed by H. Speaker | |
2012-05-03 | Enrolled; ready for sig. of H. Speaker. | |
2012-05-01 | Passed S., Ayes 31, Nays 0 | |
2012-05-01 | S. Subst. HB for comp. SB. | |
2012-04-30 | Engrossed; ready for transmission to Sen. | |
2012-04-30 | Rcvd. from H., P1C. | |
2012-04-30 | Passed H., as am., Ayes 80, Nays 8, PNV 1 | |
2012-04-30 | H. adopted am.(Amendment 3 of 0 - HA1364) | |
2012-04-30 | Am. withdrawn.(Amendment 2 - HA1288) | |
2012-04-30 | Am. withdrawn.(Amendment 1 - HA1250) | |
2012-04-30 | H. Placed on Regular Calendar for 4/30/2012 | |
2012-04-24 | Reset on Last cal. | |
2012-04-19 | H. Placed on Regular Calendar for 4/24/2012 | |
2012-04-19 | Reset on Reg cal. for 4/24/12 | |
2012-04-18 | H. Placed on Regular Calendar for 4/19/2012 | |
2012-04-18 | Reset on Next Reg. cal. | |
2012-04-12 | H. Placed on Regular Calendar for 4/18/2012 | |
2012-04-11 | Placed on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 4/12/2012 | |
2012-04-10 | Rec. For Pass. ref. to: Calendar & Rules Committee | |
2012-04-04 | Placed on cal. State & Local Government Committee for 4/10/2012 | |
2012-04-03 | Action Def. in State & Local Government Committee to 4/10/2012 | |
2012-03-28 | Placed on cal. State & Local Government Committee for 4/3/2012 | |
2012-03-27 | Action Def. in State & Local Government Committee to 4/3/2012 | |
2012-03-21 | Placed on cal. State & Local Government Committee for 3/27/2012 | |
2012-03-21 | Rec. For Pass. by s/c ref. to State & Local Government Committee | |
2012-03-14 | Placed on s/c cal S&LG Subcommittee for 3/21/2012 | |
2012-02-01 | Assigned to s/c S&LG Subcommittee | |
2012-02-01 | P2C, ref. to State & Local Government Committee | |
2012-01-30 | Intro., P1C. | |
2012-01-26 | Filed for intro. |
Same As/Similar To
SB3142 (Crossfiled) 2012-05-29 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 1055