TN HB3665 | 2011-2012 | 107th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 29 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-05-29 - Pub. Ch. 1054
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 29 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-05-29 - Pub. Ch. 1054
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, eliminates certain reporting duties of higher education institutions and governing boards; eliminates requirement that applicants for certain positions in residence halls pay for background checks; requires board of regents employees to receive longevity payments with their regular paychecks. - Amends TCA Section 4-22-103; Section 8-23-206; Section 8-44-108(b)(3) and Section 49-7-149.
Title
As enacted, eliminates certain reporting duties of higher education institutions and governing boards; eliminates requirement that applicants for certain positions in residence halls pay for background checks; requires board of regents employees to receive longevity payments with their regular paychecks. - Amends TCA Section 4-22-103; Section 8-23-206; Section 8-44-108(b)(3) and Section 49-7-149.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2012-04-27 - House - FLOOR VOTE: CONCUR IN SENATE AMENDMENT # 1 (Y: 91 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-04-26 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: THIRD CONSIDERATION AMENDED (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-03-19 - House - FLOOR VOTE: PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-03-15 - House - (VOICE VOTE) CALENDAR & RULES COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage - refer to: House Consent Calendar 1 (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2012-03-06 - House - (VOICE VOTE) FINANCE, WAYS & MEANS COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage - refer to: Calendar & Rules Committee (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2012-02-29 - House - (VOICE VOTE) FINANCE SUBCOMMITTEE: Recommended for passage - refer to: Finance, Ways & Means Committee (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2012-02-21 - House - (VOICE VOTE) EDUCATION COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage - refer to: Finance, Ways & Means Committee (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2012-02-15 - House - (VOICE VOTE) EDUCATION SUBCOMMITTEE: Recommended for passage - refer to: Education Committee (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2012-04-26 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: THIRD CONSIDERATION AMENDED (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-03-19 - House - FLOOR VOTE: PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-03-15 - House - (VOICE VOTE) CALENDAR & RULES COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage - refer to: House Consent Calendar 1 (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2012-03-06 - House - (VOICE VOTE) FINANCE, WAYS & MEANS COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage - refer to: Calendar & Rules Committee (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2012-02-29 - House - (VOICE VOTE) FINANCE SUBCOMMITTEE: Recommended for passage - refer to: Finance, Ways & Means Committee (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2012-02-21 - House - (VOICE VOTE) EDUCATION COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage - refer to: Finance, Ways & Means Committee (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2012-02-15 - House - (VOICE VOTE) EDUCATION SUBCOMMITTEE: Recommended for passage - refer to: Education Committee (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-05-29 | Pub. Ch. 1054 | |
2012-05-29 | Effective date(s) 05/21/12 | |
2012-05-21 | Signed by Governor. | |
2012-05-09 | Transmitted to Governor for his action. | |
2012-05-08 | Signed by S. Speaker | |
2012-05-03 | Signed by H. Speaker | |
2012-05-03 | Enrolled; ready for sig. of H. Speaker. | |
2012-04-27 | H. concurred in S. am. no. 1, Ayes 91, Nays 0 | |
2012-04-26 | H. Placed on Message Calendar for 4/27/2012 | |
2012-04-26 | Passed S. as am., Ayes 32, Nays 0 | |
2012-04-26 | S. adopted am. 1 | |
2012-04-26 | S. Subst. HB for comp. SB. | |
2012-03-22 | Rcvd. from H., P1C. | |
2012-03-19 | Engrossed; ready for transmission to Sen. | |
2012-03-19 | Passed H., Ayes 97, Nays 0 | |
2012-03-15 | H. Placed on Consent Calendar for 3/19/2012 | |
2012-03-14 | Placed on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 3/15/2012 | |
2012-03-06 | Rec. For Pass. ref. to: Calendar & Rules Committee | |
2012-02-29 | Placed on cal. Finance, Ways & Means Committee for 3/6/2012 | |
2012-02-29 | Rec. For Pass. by s/c ref. to Finance, Ways & Means Committee | |
2012-02-22 | Placed on s/c cal Finance Subcommittee for 2/29/2012 | |
2012-02-22 | Assigned to s/c Finance Subcommittee | |
2012-02-21 | Rec. For Pass. ref. to: Finance, Ways & Means Committee | |
2012-02-15 | Placed on cal. Education Committee for 2/21/2012 | |
2012-02-15 | Rec. For Pass. by s/c ref. to Education Committee | |
2012-02-08 | Placed on s/c cal Education Subcommittee for 2/15/2012 | |
2012-02-01 | Assigned to s/c Education Subcommittee | |
2012-02-01 | P2C, ref. to Education Committee | |
2012-01-30 | Intro., P1C. | |
2012-01-26 | Filed for intro. |
Same As/Similar To
SB3022 (Crossfiled) 2012-04-26 - Comp. HB Subst (sends SB to dead bill file)