TN HB3622 | 2011-2012 | 107th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 29 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-05-29 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 1095
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 29 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-05-29 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 1095
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, specifies that an independent postsecondary institution that was an eligible independent postsecondary institution for lottery scholarship purposes, but became ineligible because of a change in the definition of eligible independent postsecondary institution, will, until June 30, 2016, remain in eligible status so long as it is accredited by SACS. - Amends TCA Section 49-4-902(11)(B).
Title
As enacted, specifies that an independent postsecondary institution that was an eligible independent postsecondary institution for lottery scholarship purposes, but became ineligible because of a change in the definition of eligible independent postsecondary institution, will, until June 30, 2016, remain in eligible status so long as it is accredited by SACS. - Amends TCA Section 49-4-902(11)(B).
Sponsors
Rep. Jim Gotto [R] |
Roll Calls
2012-04-30 - House - (VOICE VOTE) FINANCE, WAYS & MEANS COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage w/amendments- refer to: Calendar & Rules Committee (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2012-04-30 - House - (VOICE VOTE) CALENDAR & RULES COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage - refer to: House Regular Calendar 1 (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2012-04-24 - House - (VOICE VOTE) FINANCE SUBCOMMITTEE: Recommended for passage w/amendments- refer to: Finance, Ways & Means Committee (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2012-03-13 - House - (VOICE VOTE) EDUCATION COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage - refer to: Finance, Ways & Means Committee (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2012-03-07 - House - (VOICE VOTE) EDUCATION SUBCOMMITTEE: Recommended for passage - refer to: Education Committee (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2012-04-30 - House - (VOICE VOTE) CALENDAR & RULES COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage - refer to: House Regular Calendar 1 (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2012-04-24 - House - (VOICE VOTE) FINANCE SUBCOMMITTEE: Recommended for passage w/amendments- refer to: Finance, Ways & Means Committee (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2012-03-13 - House - (VOICE VOTE) EDUCATION COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage - refer to: Finance, Ways & Means Committee (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2012-03-07 - House - (VOICE VOTE) EDUCATION SUBCOMMITTEE: Recommended for passage - refer to: Education Committee (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-05-29 | Comp. became Pub. Ch. 1095 | |
2012-05-01 | Comp. SB subst. | |
2012-04-30 | H. Placed on Regular Calendar for 4/30/2012 | |
2012-04-30 | Placed on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 4/30/2012 | |
2012-04-30 | Rec. for Pass. if Am. ref. to: Calendar & Rules Committee | |
2012-04-30 | Placed on cal. Finance, Ways & Means Committee for 4/30/2012 | |
2012-04-30 | Rec. for pass. if am. by s/c ref. to Finance, Ways & Means Committee | |
2012-04-23 | Placed on s/c cal Finance Subcommittee for 4/24/2012 | |
2012-04-23 | Action Def. in s/c Finance Subcommittee to next calendar | |
2012-04-18 | Placed on s/c cal Finance Subcommittee for 4/25/2012 | |
2012-04-18 | Assigned to s/c Finance Subcommittee | |
2012-03-13 | Rec. For Pass. ref. to: Finance, Ways & Means Committee | |
2012-03-07 | Placed on cal. Education Committee for 3/13/2012 | |
2012-03-07 | Rec. For Pass. by s/c ref. to Education Committee | |
2012-02-29 | Placed on s/c cal Education Subcommittee for 3/7/2012 | |
2012-02-15 | Action Def. in s/c Education Subcommittee to 3/7/2012 | |
2012-02-08 | Placed on s/c cal Education Subcommittee for 2/15/2012 | |
2012-02-01 | Assigned to s/c Education Subcommittee | |
2012-02-01 | P2C, ref. to Education Committee | |
2012-01-30 | Intro., P1C. | |
2012-01-26 | Filed for intro. |
Same As/Similar To
SB3170 (Crossfiled) 2012-05-29 - Pub. Ch. 1095