TN HB3620 | 2011-2012 | 107th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 26 2012 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-04-12 - Taken Off Notice For Cal. in s/c C&EA Subcommittee of Consumer & Employee Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]

Summary

As introduced, creates a new misdemeanor offense for a person who applies for employment with the intent to cause economic damage to the employer by recording on the premises of the employer and releasing such recordings to a third party. - Amends TCA Title 39; Title 40 and Title 50.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

As introduced, creates a new misdemeanor offense for a person who applies for employment with the intent to cause economic damage to the employer by recording on the premises of the employer and releasing such recordings to a third party. - Amends TCA Title 39; Title 40 and Title 50.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2012-04-12 Taken Off Notice For Cal. in s/c C&EA Subcommittee of Consumer & Employee Affairs Committee
2012-04-10 Taken Off Notice For Cal. in s/c C&EA Subcommittee of Consumer & Employee Affairs Committee
2012-04-04 Placed on s/c cal C&EA Subcommittee for 4/10/2012
2012-04-04 Action Def. in s/c C&EA Subcommittee to 4/11/2012
2012-03-28 Placed on s/c cal C&EA Subcommittee for 4/4/2012
2012-03-21 Mtg. Cancelled Action Def. in s/c C&EA Subcommittee to 3/28/12
2012-03-14 Placed on s/c cal C&EA Subcommittee for 3/21/2012
2012-03-14 Action Def. in s/c C&EA Subcommittee to 3/21/2012
2012-03-07 Placed on s/c cal C&EA Subcommittee for 3/14/2012
2012-03-07 Action Def. in s/c C&EA Subcommittee to 3/14/2012
2012-02-29 Placed on s/c cal C&EA Subcommittee for 3/7/2012
2012-02-01 Assigned to s/c C&EA Subcommittee
2012-02-01 P2C, ref. to Consumer & Employee Affairs Committee--Judiciary
2012-01-30 Intro., P1C.
2012-01-26 Filed for intro.

Same As/Similar To

SB3460 (Crossfiled) 2012-04-16 - Re-ref. to S. Cal. Comm.

Subjects


Tennessee State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback