TN HB3494 | 2009-2010 | 106th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 20 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-04-20 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 764
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 20 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-04-20 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 764
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, honors the memory of the late Connie Hall Givens by renaming, in her honor, the Coordinated School Health Improvement Act. - Amends TCA Title 49, Chapter 1, Part 10.
Title
As enacted, honors the memory of the late Connie Hall Givens by renaming, in her honor, the Coordinated School Health Improvement Act. - Amends TCA Title 49, Chapter 1, Part 10.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-04-20 | Comp. became Pub. Ch. 764 | |
2010-04-01 | Comp. SB subst. | |
2010-03-25 | Placed on Regular Calendar for 4/1/2010 | |
2010-03-23 | Placed on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 03/25/2010 | |
2010-03-17 | Rec. For Pass. ref. to: Calendar & Rules Committee | |
2010-03-10 | Placed on cal. Education Committee for 03/17/2010 | |
2010-03-10 | Rec. For Pass. by s/c ref. to Education Committee | |
2010-03-03 | Placed on s/c cal K-12 of ED for 03/10/2010 | |
2010-02-04 | Assigned to s/c K-12 of ED | |
2010-02-03 | P2C, ref. to Education Committee | |
2010-02-01 | Intro., P1C. | |
2010-01-28 | Filed for intro. |
Same As/Similar To
SB3397 (Crossfiled) 2010-04-20 - Pub. Ch. 764
Subjects
Tennessee State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://wapp.capitol.tn.gov/apps/Billinfo/default.aspx?BillNumber=HB3494&ga=106 |
Text | https://www.capitol.tn.gov/Bills/106/Bill/HB3494.pdf |