TN HB3491 | 2009-2010 | 106th General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 27 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-04-27 - Pub. Ch. 804
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]

Summary

As enacted, expands list of animal related practices that are exempt from veterinarian licensure requirements. - Amends TCA Title 63, Chapter 12.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

As enacted, expands list of animal related practices that are exempt from veterinarian licensure requirements. - Amends TCA Title 63, Chapter 12.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2010-04-05 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2010-04-27 Pub. Ch. 804
2010-04-27 Effective date(s) 04/19/10
2010-04-19 Signed by Governor.
2010-04-08 Transmitted to Governor for his action.
2010-04-07 Signed by S. Speaker
2010-04-07 Signed by H. Speaker
2010-04-06 Enrolled; ready for sig. of H. Speaker.
2010-04-05 Passed S., Ayes 30, Nays 0
2010-04-05 S. Subst. HB for comp. SB.
2010-03-17 Rcvd. from H., P1C.
2010-03-15 Engrossed; ready for transmission to Sen.
2010-03-15 Passed H., as am., Ayes 89, Nays 4, PNV 1
2010-03-15 H. adopted am.(Amendment 1 of 0 - HA0992)
2010-03-11 Placed on Regular Calendar for 3/15/2010
2010-03-10 Placed on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 03/11/2010
2010-03-09 Rec. for Pass. if Am. ref. to: Calendar & Rules Committee
2010-03-03 Placed on cal. Agriculture Committee for 03/09/2010
2010-02-03 P2C, ref. to Agriculture Committee
2010-02-01 Intro., P1C.
2010-01-28 Filed for intro.

Same As/Similar To

SB3060 (Crossfiled) 2010-04-27 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 804

Subjects


Tennessee State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback