TN HB3462 | 2009-2010 | 106th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 20 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-04-20 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 752
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 20 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-04-20 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 752
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, removes provision that would repeal the inclusion of certain nonprofit public benefit corporations as a "governmental entity" in Shelby County. - Amends TCA Title 29, Chapter 20.
Title
As enacted, removes provision that would repeal the inclusion of certain nonprofit public benefit corporations as a "governmental entity" in Shelby County. - Amends TCA Title 29, Chapter 20.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-04-20 | Comp. became Pub. Ch. 752 | |
2010-03-29 | Comp. SB subst. | |
2010-03-25 | Placed on Consent Calendar for 3/29/2010 | |
2010-03-23 | Placed on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 03/25/2010 | |
2010-03-02 | Rec. For Pass. ref. to: Calendar & Rules Committee | |
2010-02-24 | Placed on cal. Judiciary Committee for 03/02/2010 | |
2010-02-24 | Rec. For Pass. by s/c ref. to Judiciary Committee | |
2010-02-17 | Placed on s/c cal Civil Practice and Procedure of JUD for 02/24/2010 | |
2010-02-03 | Assigned to s/c Civil Practice and Procedure of JUD | |
2010-02-03 | P2C, ref. to Judiciary Committee | |
2010-02-01 | Intro., P1C. | |
2010-01-28 | Filed for intro. |
Same As/Similar To
SB3296 (Crossfiled) 2010-04-20 - Pub. Ch. 752
Subjects
Tennessee State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://wapp.capitol.tn.gov/apps/Billinfo/default.aspx?BillNumber=HB3462&ga=106 |
Text | https://www.capitol.tn.gov/Bills/106/Bill/HB3462.pdf |