TN HB3454 | 2009-2010 | 106th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 20 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-04-20 - Pub. Ch. 738
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 20 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-04-20 - Pub. Ch. 738
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, requires that permanent educational records for students who have been in state custody be forwarded to the department when a department provider agency school ceases operations or when the department no longer contracts with the provider agency. - Amends TCA Title 37 and Title 49.
Title
As enacted, requires that permanent educational records for students who have been in state custody be forwarded to the department when a department provider agency school ceases operations or when the department no longer contracts with the provider agency. - Amends TCA Title 37 and Title 49.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-04-20 | Pub. Ch. 738 | |
2010-04-20 | Effective date(s) 07/01/10 | |
2010-04-09 | Signed by Governor. | |
2010-03-29 | Transmitted to Governor for his action. | |
2010-03-29 | Signed by S. Speaker | |
2010-03-25 | Signed by H. Speaker | |
2010-03-24 | Enrolled; ready for sig. of H. Speaker. | |
2010-03-24 | Passed S., Ayes 31, Nays 0 | |
2010-03-24 | S. Subst. HB for comp. SB. | |
2010-03-10 | Rcvd. from H., P1C. | |
2010-03-08 | Engrossed; ready for transmission to Sen. | |
2010-03-08 | Passed H., Ayes 96, Nays 1 | |
2010-03-04 | H. Placed on Consent Calendar for 3/08/10 | |
2010-03-03 | Placed on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 03/04/2010 | |
2010-03-02 | Rec. For Pass. ref. to: Calendar & Rules Committee | |
2010-02-24 | Placed on cal. Children and Family Affairs Committee for 03/02/2010 | |
2010-02-23 | Rec. For Pass. by s/c ref. to Children and Family Affairs Committee | |
2010-02-17 | Placed on s/c cal Domestic Relations of C&FA for 02/23/2010 | |
2010-02-03 | Assigned to s/c Domestic Relations of C&FA | |
2010-02-03 | P2C, ref. to Children and Family Affairs Committee | |
2010-02-01 | Intro., P1C. | |
2010-01-28 | Filed for intro. |
Same As/Similar To
SB3225 (Crossfiled) 2010-04-20 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 738
Subjects
Tennessee State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://wapp.capitol.tn.gov/apps/Billinfo/default.aspx?BillNumber=HB3454&ga=106 |
Text | https://www.capitol.tn.gov/Bills/106/Bill/HB3454.pdf |