TN HB2998 | 2009-2010 | 106th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 28 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-05-28 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 932
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 28 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-05-28 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 932
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, allows a municipality to contract with another collecting official within the same county to outsource processing of property tax relief applications. - Amends TCA Title 67, Chapter 5, Part 7.
Title
As enacted, allows a municipality to contract with another collecting official within the same county to outsource processing of property tax relief applications. - Amends TCA Title 67, Chapter 5, Part 7.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-05-28 | Comp. became Pub. Ch. 932 | |
2010-05-10 | Comp. SB subst. | |
2010-05-05 | H. Placed on Regular Calendar for 5/10/10 | |
2010-05-05 | Reset on Reg cal. for 5/10/10 | |
2010-04-29 | H. Placed on Regular Calendar for 5/05/10 | |
2010-04-29 | Reset on reg cal. for 5/05/10 | |
2010-04-27 | Placed on Regular Calendar for 4/29/2010 | |
2010-04-23 | Placed on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 04/27/2010 | |
2010-04-20 | Rec. for Pass. if Am. ref. to: Calendar & Rules Committee | |
2010-04-14 | Placed on cal. State & Local Government Committee for 04/20/2010 | |
2010-04-13 | Action Def. in State & Local Government Committee to 4/20/2010 | |
2010-04-07 | Placed on cal. State & Local Government Committee for 04/13/2010 | |
2010-04-06 | Action Def. in State & Local Government Committee to 4/13/2010 | |
2010-03-31 | Placed on cal. State & Local Government Committee for 04/06/2010 | |
2010-03-31 | Rec. For Pass. by s/c ref. to State & Local Government Committee | |
2010-03-24 | Placed on s/c cal Local Government of S&LG for 03/31/2010 | |
2010-03-24 | Action Def. in s/c Local Government of S&LG to 3/31/2010 | |
2010-03-17 | Placed on s/c cal Local Government of S&LG for 03/24/2010 | |
2010-02-10 | Assigned to s/c Local Government of S&LG | |
2010-01-28 | P2C, ref. to State & Local Government Committee | |
2010-01-27 | Intro., P1C. | |
2010-01-26 | Filed for intro. |
Same As/Similar To
SB3361 (Crossfiled) 2010-05-28 - Pub. Ch. 932
Subjects
Tennessee State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://wapp.capitol.tn.gov/apps/Billinfo/default.aspx?BillNumber=HB2998&ga=106 |
Text | https://www.capitol.tn.gov/Bills/106/Bill/HB2998.pdf |