TN HB2997 | 2023-2024 | 113th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 17 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-17 - Comp. became Pr. Ch. 46
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 17 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-17 - Comp. became Pr. Ch. 46
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Subject to local approval, removes authority of the board of mayor and aldermen to elect a town marshal or marshals; removes authority of a member of the board to serve as city recorder; repeals residency requirement for a person to be elected as city recorder. - Amends Chapter 286 of the Private Acts of 1943; as amended.
Title
AN ACT to amend Chapter 286 of the Private Acts of 1943; as amended by Chapter 19 of the Private Acts of 1997; and any other acts amendatory thereto, relative to the Town of Gates.
Sponsors
Rep. Chris Hurt [R] |
Roll Calls
2024-04-01 - House - FLOOR VOTE: CONSENT CALENDAR PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 92 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-17 | Comp. became Pr. Ch. 46 | |
2024-04-01 | House | Comp. SB subst. |
2024-03-28 | House | H. Placed on Consent Calendar for 4/1/2024 |
2024-03-27 | House | Placed on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 3/28/2024 |
2024-03-26 | House | Rec. for pass; ref to Calendar & Rules Committee |
2024-03-20 | House | Placed on cal. Local Government Committee for 3/26/2024 |
2024-03-18 | House | P2C, ref. to Local Government Committee |
2024-03-14 | House | Intro., P1C. |
2024-03-12 | House | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
SB2978 (Crossfiled) 2024-04-17 - Pr. Ch. 46