TN HB2933 | 2023-2024 | 113th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 31 2024 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2024-03-27 - Taken off notice for cal in s/c Health Subcommittee of Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 31 2024 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2024-03-27 - Taken off notice for cal in s/c Health Subcommittee of Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, requires the medical examiner's office or regional forensic center to ascertain and document current psychotropic drug use, and prescription drug use from the past 10 years, by a deceased individual who died under suspicious, unusual, or unnatural circumstances, and any blood, tissue, or other tests as necessary; requires the medical examiner’s office to disclose the psychotropic drug use of the individual to the public, to ensure accurate vital statistics relating to homicides and suicides. - Amends TCA Title 38.
Title
AN ACT to amend Tennessee Code Annotated, Title 38, relative to investigations of certain events.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-03-27 | House | Taken off notice for cal in s/c Health Subcommittee of Health Committee |
2024-03-20 | House | Placed on s/c cal Health Subcommittee for 3/26/2024 |
2024-03-20 | House | Action Def. in s/c Health Subcommittee to 3/26/2024 |
2024-03-13 | House | Placed on s/c cal Health Subcommittee for 3/19/2024 |
2024-02-07 | House | Assigned to s/c Health Subcommittee |
2024-02-05 | House | P2C, ref. to Health Committee |
2024-02-01 | House | Intro., P1C. |
2024-01-31 | House | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
SB2937 (Crossfiled) 2024-03-27 - Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate Health & Welfare Committee