TN HB2931 | 2023-2024 | 113th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 13 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-05-13 - Effective date(s) 07/01/2024
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 13 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-05-13 - Effective date(s) 07/01/2024
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, requires a judge who enters into a deferred discipline agreement regarding a matter before the board of judicial conduct to sign an affidavit stating that the judge consents to the recommendation of the investigative panel, the consent is freely and voluntarily rendered, there is a pending proceeding involving allegations of misconduct, which must be specifically set forth in the affidavit, and the facts set forth in the affidavit are true; requires the affidavit to be filed with the board upon its approval by a hearing panel. - Amends TCA Title 16 and Title 17.
Title
AN ACT to amend Tennessee Code Annotated, Title 16 and Title 17, relative to the board of judicial conduct.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-04-15 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: Third Consideration (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-03-28 - House - FLOOR VOTE: REGULAR CALENDAR AS AMENDED PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 87 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-03-28 - House - FLOOR VOTE: REGULAR CALENDAR AS AMENDED PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 87 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-05-13 | Effective date(s) 07/01/2024 | |
2024-05-13 | Pub. Ch. 922 | |
2024-05-03 | Signed by Governor. | |
2024-04-24 | House | Transmitted to Governor for his action. |
2024-04-23 | Senate | Signed by Senate Speaker |
2024-04-23 | House | Signed by H. Speaker |
2024-04-16 | House | Enrolled; ready for sig. of H. Speaker. |
2024-04-15 | Senate | Passed Senate, Ayes 29, Nays 0 |
2024-04-15 | Senate | Amendment withdrawn. (Amendment 1 - SA0957) |
2024-04-15 | Senate | Senate substituted House Bill for companion Senate Bill. |
2024-04-01 | Senate | Received from House, Passed on First Consideration |
2024-03-28 | House | Engrossed; ready for transmission to Sen. |
2024-03-28 | House | Passed H., as am., Ayes 87, Nays 0, PNV 1 |
2024-03-28 | House | H. adopted am. (Amendment 1 - HA0766) |
2024-03-21 | House | H. Placed on Regular Calendar for 3/28/2024 |
2024-03-20 | House | Placed on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 3/21/2024 |
2024-03-20 | House | Rec. for pass. if am., ref. to Calendar & Rules Committee |
2024-03-13 | House | Placed on cal. Civil Justice Committee for 3/20/2024 |
2024-03-12 | House | Rec for pass if am by s/c ref. to Civil Justice Committee |
2024-03-12 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2024-03-06 | House | Placed on s/c cal Civil Justice Subcommittee for 3/12/2024 |
2024-02-07 | House | Assigned to s/c Civil Justice Subcommittee |
2024-02-05 | House | P2C, ref. to Civil Justice Committee |
2024-02-01 | House | Intro., P1C. |
2024-01-31 | House | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
SB2793 (Crossfiled) 2024-05-13 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 922