TN HB2931 | 2019-2020 | 111th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 8-0)
Status: Introduced on June 2 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-06-08 - Taken off notice for cal. in Delayed Bills Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on June 2 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-06-08 - Taken off notice for cal. in Delayed Bills Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, requires the governor to receive approval from the General Assembly prior to continuing a state of emergency for longer than 30 days. - Amends TCA Title 4; Title 8; Title 9, Chapter 4, Part 53; Title 10; Title 11; Title 12; Title 41; Title 50; Title 54 and Title 58.
Title
As introduced, requires the governor to receive approval from the General Assembly prior to continuing a state of emergency for longer than 30 days. - Amends TCA Title 4; Title 8; Title 9, Chapter 4, Part 53; Title 10; Title 11; Title 12; Title 41; Title 50; Title 54 and Title 58.
Sponsors
Rep. Bruce Griffey [R] | Rep. Clay Doggett [R] | Rep. Timothy Hill [R] | Rep. Matthew Hill [R] |
Rep. James Van Huss [R] | Rep. Justin Lafferty [R] | Rep. Bud Hulsey [R] | Rep. David Byrd [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-06-08 | House | Taken off notice for cal. in Delayed Bills Committee |
2020-06-05 | House | Placed on cal. Delayed Bills Committee for 6/8/2020 |
2020-06-02 | House | Ref. to Delayed Bills Comm. |
2020-06-02 | House | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
SB2938 (Crossfiled) 2020-06-09 - Filed for introduction