TN HB2921 | 2019-2020 | 111th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 22 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-07-22 - Pr. Ch. 53
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 22 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-07-22 - Pr. Ch. 53
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Summary
Subject to local approval, authorizes the appointment of a city administrator; shifts certain duties of the mayor to the city administrator. - Amends Chapter 182 of the Private Acts of 1998; as amended.
Title
Subject to local approval, authorizes the appointment of a city administrator; shifts certain duties of the mayor to the city administrator. - Amends Chapter 182 of the Private Acts of 1998; as amended.
Sponsors
Rep. Kirk Haston [R] |
Roll Calls
2020-06-17 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: Motion to Adopt (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-15 - House - FLOOR VOTE: CONSENT CALENDAR PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 70 N: 1 NV: 17 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-15 - House - FLOOR VOTE: CONSENT CALENDAR PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 70 N: 1 NV: 17 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-07-22 | Pr. Ch. 53 | |
2020-07-15 | Signed by Governor. | |
2020-07-06 | House | Transmitted to Governor for his action. |
2020-06-30 | Senate | Signed by Senate Speaker |
2020-06-30 | House | Signed by H. Speaker |
2020-06-18 | House | Enrolled; ready for sig. of H. Speaker. |
2020-06-17 | Senate | Passed Senate, Ayes 32, Nays 0 |
2020-06-17 | Senate | Senate substituted House Bill for companion Senate Bill. |
2020-06-17 | Senate | Received from House, Passed on First Consideration |
2020-06-15 | House | Engrossed; ready for transmission to Sen. |
2020-06-15 | House | Passed H., Ayes 71, Nays 1, PNV 18 |
2020-06-11 | House | H. Placed on Consent Calendar for 6/15/2020 |
2020-06-10 | House | Placed on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 6/11/2020 |
2020-06-09 | House | Rec. for pass; ref to Calendar & Rules Committee |
2020-06-03 | House | Placed on cal. Naming, Designating, & Private Acts Committee for 6/9/2020 |
2020-06-02 | House | P2C, ref. to Naming, Designating, & Private Acts Committee |
2020-06-01 | House | Intro., P1C. |
2020-05-15 | House | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
SB2929 (Crossfiled) 2020-07-22 - Comp. became Pr. Ch. 53