TN HB2920 | 2023-2024 | 113th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 31 2024 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2024-02-07 - Assigned to s/c Criminal Justice Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 31 2024 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2024-02-07 - Assigned to s/c Criminal Justice Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, requires, as a condition of bail or other pretrial release, that a person charged with stalking, aggravated stalking, or especially aggravated stalking undergo a mental health evaluation prior to release. - Amends TCA Title 36; Title 39 and Title 40.
Title
AN ACT to amend Tennessee Code Annotated, Title 36; Title 39 and Title 40, relative to stalking.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-02-07 | House | Assigned to s/c Criminal Justice Subcommittee |
2024-02-05 | House | P2C, ref. to Criminal Justice Committee |
2024-02-01 | House | Intro., P1C. |
2024-01-31 | House | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
SB2831 (Crossfiled) 2024-04-01 - Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate Judiciary Committee